This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:35:04 (UTC).

WILSON VS WILSON

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 WILSON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WILSON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0341

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WILSON, JASON

Respondent

WILSON, RITA

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Court Trial

Court Trial 07/09/2019: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

Confirmation of Special Setting

Confirmation of Special Setting 07/03/2019: Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 04/10/2019: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Trial

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 12/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial; Party: Names: WILSON, JASON; WILSON, RITA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Comment: STATUS DATE 7/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketAppointment Of Court Commissioner / Judge Pro Tempore - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketExhibit(s) List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial - Court Trial 07/09/2019: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConfirmation of Special Setting - Confirmation of Special Setting 07/03/2019: Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketTrial Brief

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketProperty Declaration - Comment: AMENDED STIRICKEN BY ORDER OF JWW ON 12/26/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketAmended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less