This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 21:45:14 (UTC).

WILSON VS. WILSON

Case Summary

On 03/17/2015 WILSON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WILSON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dulcich, Judith K., Camacho, Marcos R., Katz, Steven M. and Shayer, Steven. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2117

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dulcich, Judith K.

Camacho, Marcos R.

Katz, Steven M.

Shayer, Steven

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WILSON, TARA N

Respondent

WILSON, BOBBY G

 

Court Documents

Default

MO-DEFAULT: Judicial Officer: Katz, Steven M.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: WILSON, TARA N

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2015
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault - MO-DEFAULT: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketDefault - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY DECLARATION IS ORDERED SET FOR DEFAULT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.