This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/06/2021 at 10:13:11 (UTC).

WILLIS VS WEDEKING-WHITE

Case Summary

On 12/04/2020 WILLIS filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against WEDEKING-WHITE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2851

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BYRON, WILLIS

Defendants

CITY OF BAKERSFIELD

LUEVANO, SANTOS

COUNTY OF KERN

WEDEKING-WHITE, LISA

BAKERSFIELD POLICE DEPARTMENT

KERN COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

KERN COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATKINS, ASHTON R

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 03/22/2021 Hearing Time: 9:15AM Hearing Department/Division:11

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 03/22/2021 Hearing Time: 9:15AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: by Clerk as to plaintiff Byron Willis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KERN COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE is a litigant

Latest cases where KERN COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF BAKERSFIELD, A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WATKINS ASHTON RYAN