This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 07:20:06 (UTC).

WILLIE LEE BOTTLEY CONSERVATEE

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 WILLIE LEE BOTTLEY CONSERVATEE was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2025

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MCGEE, ALECHA DEON

Not Classified By Court

FAMILY COURT SERVICES

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of Related Case.... Public Defender Bin

Petition for Appointment of Conservator

Petition for Appointment of Conservator 03/02/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Need Capacity Declaration. 2. Need Kern Regional Center Report. 3. Need original citation returned and filed.

Ruling

Ruling 01/14/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: petition for appointment of conservator of the person (limited conservatorship)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of Related Case.... Public Defender Bin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator - Petition for Appointment of Conservator 03/02/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Need Capacity Declaration. 2. Need Kern Regional Center Report. 3. Need original citation returned and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketKern Regional Center Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketCourt Ordered Investigation Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketFamily Court Services Supplemental Investigator's Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 03/02/2020 @ 8:30 a.m. in Div. P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 01/14/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketCitation Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketOrder and Application Dispensing Notice - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketOrder Prescribing Notice - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketDuties of Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketReferral for Investigative Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketConfidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator - Comment: of the person limited

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.