This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/16/2021 at 11:04:17 (UTC).

WILLIAMS VS WILLIAMS, II

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 WILLIAMS filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against WILLIAMS, II. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Benavides, Jose R., Turner, Jerold L. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0045

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Benavides, Jose R.

Turner, Jerold L.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WILLIAMS, VALERIE

Respondent

WILLIAMS, MYRON, II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STOKER, IRA L

Respondent Attorney

SWANSON, JEREMY D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: PERSONAL CONDUCT ORDERS, STAY AWAY ORDERS, MOVE OUT ORDER, RECORD UNLAWFUL COOMUNICATIONS, CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT, PROPERTY CONTROL, PROPERTY RESTRAINT, INSURANCE, LAWYERS FEES AND COSTS, BATTERER INTERVENTION PROGRAM,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Turner, Jerold L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order - CLETS (New) - Judicial Officer: Turner, Jerold L.; Comment: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for DV Restraining Order New With Children - Comment: PERSONAL CONDUCT ORDERS, STAY AWAY ORDERS, MOVE OUT ORDER, RECORD UNLAWFUL COOMUNICATIONS, CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT, PROPERTY CONTROL, PROPERTY RESTRAINT, INSURANCE, LAWYERS FEES AND COSTS, BATTERER INTERVENTION PROGRAM,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWANSON, JEREMY D