This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 08:04:02 (UTC).

WILLIAMS VS WILLIAMS (E)

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 WILLIAMS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WILLIAMS E. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Webster, Jason W. and Turner, Jerold L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2317

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Webster, Jason W.

Turner, Jerold L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Williams, Myron E

Respondent

Williams, Valerie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SWANSON, JEREMY D

Respondent Attorney

STOKER, IRA L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: DV/TRO INITIALLY FILED IN CHILD CASE ON 5/19/21 5/19/21 C/C C/V C/S MOVE OUT PROP CNTRL/RSTRNT INS ATTY F/C 3 MINORS CONTD FROM 06/21/21 CONTESTED HRG T/E: 3HRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 5/25/21 PET MOD DV-TRO IN RELATED CASE (SFL-21-000045) C/C C/V CNTRL DRUG TEST 3 MINORS cont from 07/29/21, 09/15/21 *SERVICE ISSUES*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 5/19/2021 PET C/C C/V APPOINT MINORS COUNSEL 3 MINORS cont from 07/29/21, 09/15/21 *SERVICE ISSUES*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 06/21/2021 PET MOD DV/TRO C/C C/V IN RELATED CASE (SFL-21-000045) 3 MINORS cont from 07/29/21, 09/15/21 *SERVICE ISSUES*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCase Status Conference - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: STATUS ONLY: PET DV/TRO INITIALLY FILED IN CHILD CASE ON 05/19/21 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V C/S MOVE OUT PROP/CNTRL/RSTRNT INS ATTY F/C 3 MINORS cont from 07/29/21 09/15/21 *SET FOR CONTESTED HEARING ON 01/24/22 AT 1:30 PM IN DIV E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Tentative Setting - FL - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Comment: SWANSON ODELL SET C/C C/V 1 MINOR 661-326-1611 ERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketSubpoenaed Records Received - Comment: SHAFTER POLICE DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: 5/25/21 PET MOD DV-TRO IN RELATED CASE (SFL-21-000045) C/C C/V CNTRL DRUG TEST 3 MINORS cont from 07/29/21 *SERVICE ISSUES*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: 5/19/2021 PET C/C C/V APPOINT MINORS COUNSEL 3 MINORS cont from 07/29/21 *SERVICE ISSUES*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: 06/21/2021 PET MOD DV/TRO C/C C/V IN RELATED CASE (SFL-21-000045) 3 MINORS cont from 07/29/21 *SERVICE ISSUES*

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDrug Screening Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDrug Screening Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketTemporary Emergency Court Orders Denied (FL-305)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET EX PARTE C/C C/V 1 MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Compliance - Comment: E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: E-FILED Request for Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: E-FILED Petition or other First Paper Filed (up to $435.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: E-FILED Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STOKER, IRA L