This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/28/2020 at 14:11:56 (UTC).

WILLIAMS VS RAYMOND

Case Summary

On 04/16/2013 WILLIAMS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RAYMOND. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6650

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS, KIMBERLY

Defendants

RAYMOND, HAROLD FRANCIS

HAROLD FRANCIS RAYMOND

HADDOCK, STEVEN CRAIG

A SIGN FACTORY AND GRAPHIC SHOP

SIGN FACTORY AND GRAPHIC SHOP A

THE THREAD & INK SIGN FACTORY

THE SIGN FACTORY

A SIGN FACTORY

THE THREAD & INK FACTORY

BD I- INDUSTRIES

GRAPHICS FACTORY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITTINGTON, MICHAEL T

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketWrit Returned Partially Satisfied - Comment: County of Kern

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • DocketNP1095 - Comment: Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: HAROLD FRANCIS RAYMOND DEBTOR'S EXAMINATION. HEARING AFTER TRIAL. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: KIMBERLY WILLIAMS (PL-1) APPEARS BY MICHAEL T WHITTINGTON ESQ. HAROLD FRANCIS RAYMOND (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. *************************************************************************************** THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: JUDGMENT DEBTOR SWORN AND RETIRED FROM THE COURTROOM FOR INFORMAL EXAMINATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • Docket4082 Debtors Examination - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: AS TO HAROLD FRANCIS RAYMON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • DocketDebtor's Examination - Original Type: Debtor's Examination; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: AS TO HAROLD FRANCIS RAYMON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO HAROLD FRANCIS RAYMOND RE: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • DocketOrder to Appear for Exam - Comment: AS TO HAROLD FRANCIS RAYMON **ETIENNE** (5/7/14, 830AM, D-12)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • Docket172F Pmt: Motion/Stip/OSC/Demurrer GC 70617(A) - Comment: Amount of $60.00 for WILLIAMS, KIMBERLY (PL-1). Received from MICHAEL T WHITTINGTON, check no(s) 2575. Receipt #770278 for amount of $60.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: IN ORDER TO ISSUE NEW CORRECTED WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2013
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 30, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 30, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 360

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 180

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 738

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: FILED BY MICHAEL T. WHITTINGTON CMC 10/15/13AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: FILED BY TODD L. CRAMER, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.