This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 12:14:14 (UTC).

WILLIAMS VS JAMES ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 WILLIAMS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JAMES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Lampe, David R. and Friedman, Gary T.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2501

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Lampe, David R.

Friedman, Gary T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS, PHILIP

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

JAMES, DON

S&T PROFESSIONAL GROUP, INC.

F STREET MEDICAL PARTNERS LLC

JAMES, DAVID

Cross Defendant

S & T PROFESSIONAL GROUP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOHNSON, CRAIG E

HANSEN, JOHNNA J

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

FLORES, ZOJEILA I

TRIMBLE, JOAN E.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

TRIMBLE, JOAN E.

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Minute Order 4/17/2018: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 06/22/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: FLORES, ZOJEILA I; Defendant; Attorney: FLORES, ZOJEILA I; Defendant; Attorney: FLORES, ZOJEILA I; Cross Complainant; Attorney: FLORES, ZOJEILA I; Cross Complainant; Attorney: FLORES, ZOJEILA I; Cross Complainant; Attorney: FLORES, ZOJEILA I

Ruling

Minute Order 11/7/16: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: as to Complaint only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With Prejudice on Entire Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketRuling/Certificate of Progress - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: DISMISSAL RE-SET FOR JULY 23, 2018, AT 8:30 AM, IN DEPARTMENT 11 ***DAVID R. LAMPE 5/29/2018***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Progress

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: jury requested by defendant;4-5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: jury requested by defendant; 4-5 days; trial concurrent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Friedman, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: jury trial/fcm in d-11; jury requested by defendant; 4-5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: without prejudice as to Cross-Complaint filed by F Street Medical Partners LLC, Don James and David James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Unconditional

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2016
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes - Comment: to Judge Lampe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Minute Order 11/7/16: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge-170.6 - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: Filed by Craig E. Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ATTORNEY'S FOLDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: AS TO PHILIP WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/06/17 Hearing Time: 08:00 AM Hearing Department/Division:4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 03/18/2017; Served: 03/18/2017; Served: 03/03/2017; Served: 01/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO PHILIP WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less