This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 07:15:54 (UTC).

WILLIAMS VS DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES, AN AGENCY OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, BY AND THROUGH ITS DIRECTOR STEVEN GORDON

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 WILLIAMS filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES, AN AGENCY OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, BY AND THROUGH ITS DIRECTOR STEVEN GORDON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bradshaw, J. Eric. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0007

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Bradshaw, J. Eric

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WILLIAMS, MICHAEL LEO

Respondent

DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES, AN AGENCY OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, BY AND THROUGH ITS DIRECTOR STEVEN GORDON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

THOMPSON, JARED M

BREHMER, JEREMY C

Respondent Attorney

SCHREIBER, MARK

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 03/03/2020: Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 01/15/2020: Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 03/03/2020: Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Lodging - Comment: NOTICE OF LODGING ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. LODGED OVER THE PUBLIC COUNTER WITH 1 CD WHICH IS THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketAdministrative Record - Comment: Administrative Record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Lodging Administrative Record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition - Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 01/15/2020: Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Demand for Administrative Record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration re Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Petitioner in Support of Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application / Petition - Comment: Ex Parte Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: WILLIAMS, MICHAEL LEO; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes - Comment: J. Eric Bradshaw

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.