This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/31/2020 at 09:11:29 (UTC).

WILLIAMS VS ALCALA

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 WILLIAMS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against ALCALA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0021

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS, GERRY

Defendant

ALCALA, D.

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Summons: Bottom portion of summons must be blank for the Court to issue. Please uncheck #1 at the bottom of the page and resubmit. Also, a proof of service is not to be attached, you only serve this on the defendant after the Court issues it.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Gerry Williams Re: Summons Reason: Please resubmit the Summons without the address sticker under the Plaintiff name and without the /D77087. Please make sure it conforms exactly to the Complaint. Thank you

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: Continued from 04/01/2020 by Standing Order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketFacsimile Transmission Cover Sheet - Comment: 7/2/20 Court Call Confirmation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: and Order 1. The application for an order extending time to serve and file the pleading is granted. 2. The pleading must be served and filed no later than 7/1/20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketRequest For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s): Filed prematurley due to Emergency Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: as to D ALCALA; Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketFacsimile Transmission Cover Sheet - Comment: Sent to: California State Prison Re: 4/20/20 OSC & 7/6/20 CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Summons: Bottom portion of summons must be blank for the Court to issue. Please uncheck #1 at the bottom of the page and resubmit. Also, a proof of service is not to be attached, you only serve this on the defendant after the Court issues it.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Gerry Williams Re: Summons Reason: Please resubmit the Summons without the address sticker under the Plaintiff name and without the /D77087. Please make sure it conforms exactly to the Complaint. Thank you

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re:3.110 Hearing Date: 4/20/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 03/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.