This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 09:07:56 (UTC).

WILLIAM MILLER, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED VS MUD CHECK, INC., A TEXAS CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/09/2015 WILLIAM MILLER, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MUD CHECK, INC , A TEXAS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Friedman - Retired, Gary T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0921

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Friedman - Retired, Gary T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MILLER, WILLIAM

WILLIAM MILLER, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

MARTINEZ, ROMEIN

Defendants

CHEVRON U.S.A. INC

CENTURY EXPLORATION RESOURCES,LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MUD CHECK, INC., A TEXAS CORPORATION

COTTRELL, ED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BLANCHARD, LONNIE C

DION-KINDEM, PETER R

Defendant Attorneys

SODERSTROM, JAMIN S.

TROTTER, JULIE R

VANPARYS, JOEL MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 12/12/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BLANCHARD, LONNIE C; Plaintiff; Attorney: BLANCHARD, LONNIE C

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 09/08/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Cont'd from 05/24/17; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BLANCHARD, LONNIE C; Plaintiff; Attorney: BLANCHARD, LONNIE C; Defendant; Attorney: SODERSTROM, JAMIN S.

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 05/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BLANCHARD, LONNIE C; Plaintiff; Attorney: BLANCHARD, LONNIE C; Defendant; Attorney: SODERSTROM, JAMIN S.

Ruling

Ruling 04/14/2017: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 10/31/2016: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: SODERSTROM, JAMIN S.

Motion to Stay (Pre-Disposition)

07/26/2016 Minute Order: Motion for Temporary Stay: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 6/14/16, by Defendant Chevron USA, INC. Motion for Temporary Stay. ResID: 16259.; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: SODERSTROM, JAMIN S.

Ruling

05/18/16 - M.O. RULING: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 02:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Demurrer

4/29/16 M.O.-Chevron USA, Inc.'s Demurrer & Motion to Stay Based on Exclusive C/C Jurisdiction: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed by Defendant, Chevron USA, Inc. Demurrer and Motion to Stay. ResID: 15608.; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: SODERSTROM, JAMIN S.

Case Management Conference

03/14/16 MO: Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BLANCHARD, LONNIE C; Plaintiff; Attorney: BLANCHARD, LONNIE C; Defendant; Attorney: SODERSTROM, JAMIN S.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re-notice -- case number incorrect.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Notice of continuance -- need 2 separate re-notices with $20 for each hearing.

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 05/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BLANCHARD, LONNIE C; Plaintiff; Attorney: BLANCHARD, LONNIE C; Plaintiff; Attorney: BLANCHARD, LONNIE C

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 11/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BLANCHARD, LONNIE C; Plaintiff; Attorney: BLANCHARD, LONNIE C; Defendant; Attorney: SODERSTROM, JAMIN S.

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 01/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT'D FROM 10/31/16; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: SODERSTROM, JAMIN S.

Ruling

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

06/06/16 - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Cont'd from 03/14/16; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: SODERSTROM, JAMIN S.

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: on all other issues

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: (on all other issues) J/T SET 6/01/21 9AM DEPT 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: (on all other issues) J/T SET 06/01/21 9AM DEPT 11 AND FSC SET 05/21/21 130PM DEPT 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: Re: the severed issue of employment status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: Re: the severed issue of employment status; BIFURCATED J/T 8/17/20 9AM DEPT 11 T/E 20 DAYS JURY FOR PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT CHEVRON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: Re: the severed issue of employment status; J/T SET 8/17/20 9AM DEPT 11 T/E 20 DAYS AND FSC SET 8/7/20 130PM DEPT 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketMotion (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: ***Continued from 04/08/2020 by Standing Order. *** 3/9/2020 Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Amended Declaration of Romein Martinez in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Amended Declaration of William Miller in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Romein Martinez in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
303 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE, AS TO, EDWARD J. COTTRELL. 3A DOES NOT CONFORM TO THE COMPLAINT. 3B IS INCOMPLETE, SPECIFY ENTITY OR IF AUTHORIZED AGENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, PERSONAL, AS TO, CENTURY EXPLORATION RESOURCES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. 10/06/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • DocketJury Non-refundable fee pursuant to CCP 631 paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: FILED BY LONNIE C. BLANCHARD III, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 09/29/2015; Served: 09/29/2015; Served: 10/07/2015; Served: 10/06/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACTIVE LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/4/16 Hearing Time: 830 AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: FILED BY LONNIE C. BLANCHARD,III CMC 3/8/16 @ 830 AM D11

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.