Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:02:34 (UTC).

WILLIAM ALTON SANDLIN DECEASED

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 WILLIAM ALTON SANDLIN DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Wyatt, Ralph W. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2212

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Wyatt, Ralph W.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SANDLIN, MARIA DJ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

VON TUNGELIN, KEVIN L

 

Court Documents

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200 07/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. Petition does not set forth an estimate of time needed to close the administration of the estate per PC 12201(a).; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: VON TUNGELIN, KEVIN L

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200 11/09/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

Petition for Letters

PETITION FOR LETTERS: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Declaration

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 01/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Need Receipt of Preliminary Distribution of Victrola phonograph from Robert Sandlin. 2. Need detailed itemization/billing entries re x-o services requested by petitioner/Administrator. 3. Need proof of mailing to Supplement filed 01/12/18.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: VON TUNGELIN, KEVIN L

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Agreement (3)

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 01/24/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - COMMENT/NOTE 1. Second Supplement filed 01/16/18 reviewed. Petitioner did not keep a log or journal of x-o services and requests x-o fees (JTD).; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: VON TUNGELIN, KEVIN L

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2018
  • Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge & Order-Estate - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration in Lieu of Receipt on Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Receipt - Comment: Receipt on Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Comment: approving First and Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 01/24/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - COMMENT/NOTE 1. Second Supplement filed 01/16/18 reviewed. Petitioner did not keep a log or journal of x-o services and requests x-o fees (JTD).; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: VON TUNGELIN, KEVIN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Notice - Comment: Notice of Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 01/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Need Receipt of Preliminary Distribution of Victrola phonograph from Robert Sandlin. 2. Need detailed itemization/billing entries re x-o services requested by petitioner/Administrator. 3. Need proof of mailing to Supplement filed 01/12/18.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: VON TUNGELIN, KEVIN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Proof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Supplement - Comment: Second Supplement to First and Final Account and Petition for Final Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Receipt - Comment: Receipt on Preliminary Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2015
  • Bond Undertaking

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • Order For Probate - Judicial Officer: Wyatt, Ralph W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Confidential Information - Comment: driver license

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters - PETITION FOR LETTERS: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • Proof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Petition for Letters of Administration - Comment: Petition for Letters of Administration Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less