This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:52:14 (UTC).

WILKINSON VS HUCKABY(B)

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 WILKINSON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HUCKABY B. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D., Stainfield, Bryan K., Loo, Cynthia L. and McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4621

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Loo, Cynthia L.

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WILKINSON, SAMANTHA

Respondent

HUCKABY, JACOB

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 06/06/2017: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 3/28/17 PET MOD C/V C/S 3 MINORS CONT'D FROM 5/02/17

Request for Order - Petitioner

11/30/16 MO: Request for Order - Petitioner: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET C/C C/V C/S S/S 3 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: WILKINSON, SAMANTHA; Respondent: HUCKABY, JACOB

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 05/02/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 03/28/17 PET MOD C/V C/S *C/V TO BE HEARD IN DIV B* **RLM CAL ALSO** NO SERVICE ON DCSS; Parties Present Petitioner: WILKINSON, SAMANTHA

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 07/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 06/20/17 PET MOD C/V C/S TAXES 3 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: WILKINSON, SAMANTHA; Respondent: HUCKABY, JACOB

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2017
  • Child Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: STATUS END DATE: 09/20/17 CLL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Notice Re Payment of Support - Comment: FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: SRV 08/15/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Findings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Comment: HEARING: 7/24/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Mediation Agreement and Order - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 07/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 06/20/17 PET MOD C/V C/S TAXES 3 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: WILKINSON, SAMANTHA; Respondent: HUCKABY, JACOB

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2016
  • Mediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY MOTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: HRG 11/30/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Proof of Personal Service - Comment: HRG 11/30/16 DIV B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Video: Putting Children First in a Changing Family - FCS - Comment: Video 'FL-2' completed by party on 10/21/2016 11:40:24.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Video: Putting Children First in a Changing Family - FCS - Comment: Video 'MED-1' completed by party on 10/21/2016 11:30:30.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less