This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/23/2020 at 09:33:20 (UTC).

WHITTAKER VS WHITTAKER(B)

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 WHITTAKER filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against WHITTAKER B. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cannon, Gloria. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1856

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cannon, Gloria

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WHITTAKER, ANGELA

Respondent

WHITTAKER, ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 05/19/2020: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 04/07/20 PET DV/TRO MOVE OUT CONT'D FROM 04/21/20

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 04/21/2020: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 04/07/20 PET DV/TRO MOVE OUT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Lack of Prosecution Before Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 05/19/2020: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 04/07/20 PET DV/TRO MOVE OUT CONT'D FROM 04/21/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Comment: Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 04/21/2020: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 04/07/20 PET DV/TRO MOVE OUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Comment: HRG 04/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketFirearms Alleged in Recent Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order - CLETS (New)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketRequest for DV Restraining Order New No Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketCourt Interpreter Services - FL

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.