This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 12:17:28 (UTC).

WHITE VS EDWARDS

Case Summary

On 11/12/2015 WHITE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against EDWARDS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0122

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHITE, JOSEPH

Defendant

EDWARDS, KERRY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: RE: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: Returned Original via In Pro Per Bin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered - Comment: As to Kerry Edwards

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: As to Kerry Edwards

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Personal Service as to Kerry Edwards

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: WHITE, JOSEPH; Served: 11/18/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 27055 N. LINCOLN ST. TAFT, CA 93268

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less