This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 18:21:39 (UTC).

WHITE VS CHILDRESS

Case Summary

On 01/26/2015 WHITE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CHILDRESS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Errea, Larry A.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9295

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Errea, Larry A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHITE, BRENDA

Defendants

CHILDRESS, KANDIS

CHILDRESS, LARRY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Errea, Larry A.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • DocketNP1500 - Comment: Department: BS Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: BRENDA WHITE (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. LARRY CHILDRESS (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. KANDIS CHILDRESS (DE-2) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. STIPULATION OF PARTIES ENTERED INTO, BASED ON THAT STIPULATION THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT IS ENTERED: . PARTIES HAVE REACHED AN AGREEMENT/STIPULATION. DEFENDANT(S) TO PAY PLAINTIFF A TOTAL OF $3,000.00 PAYABLE AT THE RATE OF $250.00 PER MONTH COMMENCING 5/15/15 AND THE 15TH OF EACH MONTH UNTIL PAID IN FULL. IF DEFENDANT(S) ARE 3 DAYS LATE, PLAINTIFF MAY RETURN TO COURT AND HAVE THE ORIGINAL AMOUNT OF $3,757.00 (PARTIES DROPPED THE CENTS OFF ORIGINAL AMOUNT ) IMPOSED MINUS ANY PAYMENTS MADE AND A JUDGMENT WILL ISSUE. PARTIES ARE TO MOVE OUT BY 3/09/15 MIDNIGHT, AND ARE TO LEAVE THE KEYS WITH NEIGHBOR GRACIE WHO LIVES AT 1942 F. STREET. DEFENDANT(S) ARE TO SEND THEIR PAYMENTS TO: MS. WHITE 6309 VERDUN AVENUE LOS ANGELES CA 90043 COURT TO RESERVE JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6 TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT HEARING BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • Docket4151 Unlawful Detainer Trial - (N6a) - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court); Judicial Officer: Errea, Larry A.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: NOTICE OF TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: TRIAL DATE SET FOR 030615 ~ calid=2771581 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4191, CourtDate:04/24/2015, Courtroom:BS, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:1, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LAE, SystemDate:1/30/2015 11:37:42 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • DocketNotice of Trial - Comment: NOTICE OF TRIAL CAUSE SET FOR TRIAL ON Mar 06, 2015 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS, OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF KERN. THE CASE WILL BE CALLED PROMPTLY AT THE SCHEDULED TIME. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF TRIAL CAUSE SET FOR TRIAL ON Mar 06, 2015 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS, OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF KERN. THE CASE WILL BE CALLED PROMPTLY AT THE SCHEDULED TIME.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • DocketRequest/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO ANY PERSON CLAIMING ANY RIGHT TO POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO KANDIS CHILDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • DocketAnswer (Verified) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.15.1(c) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15.1(c) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Apr 24, 2015 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for dismissal, a judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ LARRY A ERREA Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15.1(c) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Apr 24, 2015 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for dismissal, a judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ LARRY A ERREA Judge of the Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. _____________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 601 HIGH STREET, SUITE C, DELANO, CA 93215. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. _____________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 601 HIGH STREET, SUITE C, DELANO, CA 93215.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 1950 F STREET, WASCO, CA 93280

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • Docket841J Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee <$10,000 GC 70613(B); - Comment: Amount of $240.00 for WHITE, BRENDA (PL-1). Received from KERN COURT AND TENANT SCREENIN, check no(s) 10135. Receipt #821026 for amount of $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.