This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 23:49:51 (UTC).

WHITE ET AL VS BHALLA

Case Summary

On 08/06/2019 WHITE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BHALLA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2201

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WHITE, PATRICIA

WHITE, BRYAN

WHITE, ALLYSON

Defendant

BHALLA, PARMJEET SINGH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DOUGLASS JONATHAN W

FOWLER JASON P

Defendant Attorney

ROSS TOMAS J

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

02/03/2020: Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

11/19/2019: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Notice of Entry of Dismissal

06/16/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (Entire)

06/13/2022: Request for Dismissal (Entire)

Ruling/Certificate of Progress

04/18/2022: Ruling/Certificate of Progress

Certificate of Progress

04/14/2022: Certificate of Progress

Electronic Rejection Notice

04/14/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Ruling/Certificate of Progress

02/22/2022: Ruling/Certificate of Progress

Certificate of Progress

02/22/2022: Certificate of Progress

Ruling/Certificate of Progress

12/15/2021: Ruling/Certificate of Progress

Certificate of Progress

12/15/2021: Certificate of Progress

Case Management Statement

01/23/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

01/23/2020: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

11/25/2019: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Order to Show Cause

08/06/2019: Order to Show Cause

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

08/06/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

08/06/2019: Summons Issued and Filed

Complaint

08/06/2019: Complaint

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal; Comment: Plaintiffs' Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WHITE, ALLYSON|PLAINTIFF - WHITE, BRYAN|PLAINTIFF - WHITE, PATRICIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Entire); Comment: With Prejudice as to Entire Action; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WHITE, ALLYSON|PLAINTIFF - WHITE, BRYAN|PLAINTIFF - WHITE, PATRICIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Ruling/Certificate of Progress; Comment: The Court having fully considered Plaintiff's Certificate of Progress and request forcontinuance of the April 29, 2022, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal, and having been fullyadvised, finds as follows:Good cause exists for the continuance of the Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal.THE COURT THEREFORE ORDERS AS FOLLOWS:The Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal that is currently scheduled for April 29, 2022 ishereby continued to June 29, 2022, at 8:30 am. in Division J of the above-entitled Court.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WHITE, ALLYSON|PLAINTIFF - WHITE, BRYAN|PLAINTIFF - WHITE, PATRICIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Certificate of Progress; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WHITE, ALLYSON|PLAINTIFF - WHITE, BRYAN|PLAINTIFF - WHITE, PATRICIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: Certificate of Progress: Page 1 line 13 states the incorrect hearing date.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Ruling/Certificate of Progress; Comment: The Court having fully considered Plaintiff's Certificate of Progress and request forcontinuance of the February 28, 2022, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal, and having beenfillly advised, finds as follows:Good cause exists for the continuance of the Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal.THE COURT THEREFORE ORDERS AS FOLLOWS:The Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal that is currently scheduled for February 28, 2022is hereby continued to April 29, 2022, at 8:30 am. in Division J of the above-entitled Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Certificate of Progress; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WHITE, ALLYSON|PLAINTIFF - WHITE, PATRICIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Ruling/Certificate of Progress; Comment: The Court having fully considered Plaintiff's Certificate of Progress and request for continuance of the December 28, 2021, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal, and having been fully advised, finds as follows:Good cause exists for the continuance of the Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal. The Court Therefore Orders as follows:The Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal that is currently scheduled for December 28, 2021 is hereby continued to February 28, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. in Division "J" at 1215 Truxtun Ave., Bakersfield, CA 93301.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WHITE, ALLYSON|PLAINTIFF - WHITE, BRYAN|PLAINTIFF - WHITE, PATRICIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Certificate of Progress; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WHITE, ALLYSON|PLAINTIFF - WHITE, BRYAN|PLAINTIFF - WHITE, PATRICIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Mail Returned Undelivered; Comment: Notice of Reassignment of Judge for All Purposes dated 11/16/21 returned to the court as undelivered. Re-mailed to address as follows: 330 N Brand BLVD STE 900 Glendale CA 91203. (Notice of Change of Address included.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Filed By: DEFENDANT - BHALLA, PARMJEET SINGH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 11 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WHITE, ALLYSON|PLAINTIFF - WHITE, BRYAN|PLAINTIFF - WHITE, PATRICIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WHITE, ALLYSON|PLAINTIFF - WHITE, BRYAN|PLAINTIFF - WHITE, PATRICIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: As to defendant Parmjeet Singh Bhalla; substitute

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 11 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 11/19/2019Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M.Hearing Department/Division: 11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WHITE, ALLYSON|PLAINTIFF - WHITE, BRYAN|PLAINTIFF - WHITE, PATRICIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less