This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 10:45:57 (UTC).

WESTLAND FARMS, LLC VS G.D. GLOBAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/05/2016 WESTLAND FARMS, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against G D GLOBAL, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2351

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTLAND FARMS, LLC

Defendants

G.D. GLOBAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DIAZ, GUILLERMO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BECKMAN, PETER W

 

Court Documents

Debtor's Examination

Debtor's Examination 03/13/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: as to Guillermo Diaz

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 10/04/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: The Court sets an Order to Show Cause as to why Default Judgment has not been entered set on 06/26/17; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BECKMAN, PETER W

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 9-11-17: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 8-23-17: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 06/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: (for failure to appear by plaintiff counsel; failure to serve; failure to follow rules of court; and failure to prosecute the case); Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BECKMAN, PETER W

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 04/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 04/04/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BECKMAN, PETER W

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 02/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BECKMAN, PETER W

Ruling

Minute Order dated 12-1-16: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDebtor's Examination - Debtor's Examination 03/13/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: as to Guillermo Diaz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: as to Guillermo Diaz Hearing Date: 3/13/19 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m. Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: re: Entry of Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 10/04/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: The Court sets an Order to Show Cause as to why Default Judgment has not been entered set on 06/26/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: WESTLAND FARMS, LLC; Awarded Against: G.D. GLOBAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; DIAZ, GUILLERMO; Amount; Damages: $70,000.00; Pre-Judgment Interest: $14,728.77; Costs: $574.00; Total: $85302.77; Party: Names: WESTLAND FARMS, LLC; G.D. GLOBAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; DIAZ, GUILLERMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: as to GUILLERMO DIAZ and G.D. GLOBAL, INC.; signed by David R Lampe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: In Support of Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Calculation of Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 04/04/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 02/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: Default Only as to GUILLERMO DIAZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to GUILLERMO DIAZ subserved 10/30/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Minute Order dated 12-1-16: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ATTORNEY'S FOLDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/19/17 Hearing Time: 08:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 06/11/2017; Served: 10/30/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less