This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/14/2021 at 09:32:49 (UTC).

WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC VS MIRELES SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MIRELES SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5586

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC

Defendant

MIRELES SANCHEZ, SYLVIA J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANDELL, LOWELL C.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/26/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: 12

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/26/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANDELL, LOWELL