This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/22/2021 at 10:28:28 (UTC).

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION VS MARTON & SONS ROOFING INC., A CORPORATION, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARTON SONS ROOFING INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Pacione, Lisa M., Pacione, Lisa M., Khoury, Anthony S. and Pacione, Lisa M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0333

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Pacione, Lisa M., Pacione, Lisa M.

Khoury, Anthony S.

Pacione, Lisa M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

Defendants

MARTON & SONS ROOFING INC., A CORPORATION

PETTITT, ROBERT

PETTITT, LINDA

MINABERRIGARAI, DOMINIQUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOSA, CARLOS E

Defendant Attorney

ALEXANDER, WILLIAM L

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Pacione, Lisa M.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DECLARATION OF CARLOS E SOSA RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: 3X REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: 3 X REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Khoury, Anthony S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Pacione, Lisa M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketMotion (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Pacione, Lisa M.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Draft Incomplete; Comment: TO DEPOSIT BY STAKEHOLDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, DOMINIQUE MINABERRIGARAI, TRUSTEE OF THE MINABERRIGARAI FAMILY TRUST, TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration and Order - Judicial Officer: Pacione, Lisa M.; Comment: DF HAS UNTIL 10/18/21 TO ANSWER CERTIFICATE OF INABILITY TO RESPOND AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: 3 X REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: 3X REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPoints and Authorities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: Motion to Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: FOR DOMINIQUE MINABERRIGARAI DF HAS UNTIL 10/18/21 TO ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 09/09/2021: Judicial Officer(s): Pacione, Lisa M., Pacione, Lisa M.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Dropped

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF CARLOS E SOSA RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DECLARATION OF CARLOS E SOSA RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: FOR MARTON & SONS ROOFING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: FOR LINDA PETTITT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: FOR ROBERT PETTITT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 08/01/20219:05 AM; Served: 07/29/20211:30 PM; Served: 07/29/20211:30 PM; Served: 08/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: Complaint in Interpleader

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Western Surety Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALEXANDER WILLIAM LOUIE