Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:20:17 (UTC).

WESTERN COMMERCIAL FINANCE, LLC VS HILLCREST CENTER, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 WESTERN COMMERCIAL FINANCE, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HILLCREST CENTER, LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brehmer, Charles R., Brumfield, Lorna H. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0414

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brehmer, Charles R.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTERN COMMERCIAL FINACE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

SAMSON MISHAEL-KASHANI, TRUSTEE OF THE MISHAEL REVOCABLE FAMILY TRUST OF 2004

SINGH, RANJIT

ESHAGHIAN, SIMANTOV

HILLCREST CENTER, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DOLGEN CALIFORNIA, LLC A TENNESSEE LIMITED COMPANY

MICHAEL, SAMSON

THE WORLD OF 98 CENTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PRECISION PAVING CO., INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION

SINGH, BALJIT

CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SIMANTOV ESHAGHIAN, TRUSTEE OF THE ESHAGHIAN FAMILY TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAUN, CRAIG D

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 06/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Status Conference

Case Status Conference 06/02/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: DEFAULT

Further Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 02/27/2017: Further Case Management Conference 05/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 02/27/2017

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Further Case Management Conference

**MO - fcmc Public: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT'D FROM 08/24/16; 9/28/16 Minute Order

Motion to Amend (Pre-Disposition)

MO: Motion to Amend Complaint 09/28/2016: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 8/30/16 Plaintiff, WESTERN COMMERCIAL FINANCE, LLC Motion for Leave of Court to File First Amended Complaint ResID: 17857; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG D

Motion to Amend (Pre-Disposition)

08/23/2016 Minute Order: Motion for Leave of Court to File First Amended Complaint: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 7/29/16; 8/1/16 Amended Motion Plaintiff, WESTERN COMMERCIAL FINANCE, LLC Motion for Leave of Court to File First Amended Complaint ResID: 17586

Further Case Management Conference

**MO - Public cmc MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: WAITING ON LA CASE TO BE TRANSFERRED TO KERN COUNTY; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG D

Further Case Management Conference

**MO - Public further cmc: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 01/11/2016; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG D

Case Management Conference

**MO - Public cmc: Judicial Officer: Brehmer, Charles R.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG D

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

osc MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Party: Names: WESTERN COMMERCIAL FINACE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; HILLCREST CENTER, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Comment: This cause came on for hearing before the Honorable Thomas S. Clark, presiding in Department 17 of the above-entitled court, by way of default. Defendant Hillcrest Center, LLC ("HILLCREST") was regularly served with process and failed to appear and answer the First Amended Complaint of plaintiff, Western Commercial Finance, LLC, filed on September 28, 2016 within the time allowed by law. HILLCREST's default was duly entered on March 28, 2017. On application of plaintiff and after evidence had been received by way of declaration and Request for Judicial Notice, IT IS ORDERED as follows: 1. The Trustee's Deed Upon Sale recorded in the Official Records of Kern County on November 23, 2015 as document number 0215162027 conveyed all of the right, title and interest in the shares of stock held by Hillcrest Center, LLC in Hillcrest Parking, Inc., a California corporation, as of the date of the recording of the Deed of Trust, Assignment of Rents, Security Agreement and Fixture filing recorded in the Official Records of Kern County on March 13, 2007 as document number 0207055868 or acquired any time thereafter up to the date of the Trustee's Deed Upon Sale. 2. Plaintiff shall recover costs of suit from HILLCREST in the amount of $528.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Case Status Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: RE: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: as to HILLCREST CENTER, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company; signed by Thomas S Clark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Request for Judicial Notice - Comment: Request for Judicial Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Request for Court Judgment - Comment: Request for Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Points and Authorities - Comment: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Ruling - Ruling 06/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Status Conference - Case Status Conference 06/02/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: by personal service as to Chicago Title Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: by substituted service as to Simantov Eshaghian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: by substituted service as to Simantov Eshaghian Trustee of the Eshaghian Family Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: by substituted service as to Samson Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: by substituted service as to Hillcrest Center, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • Notice of Related Case(s) - Comment: BC584066

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/26/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less