Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:00:37 (UTC).

WEST VALLEY REAL ESTATE VS FORSTE, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 WEST VALLEY REAL ESTATE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FORSTE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0033

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEST VALLEY REAL ESTATE

Defendants

FORSTE, JOSEPH ARTHUR, Jr.

BOLIVAR-FORSTE, BRANDI AYRIEANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: WEST VALLEY REAL ESTATE; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 516 Grant Terrace Taft, CA 93268; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against: FORSTE, JOSEPH ARTHUR, Jr.; BOLIVAR-FORSTE, BRANDI AYRIEANN; Party: Names: WEST VALLEY REAL ESTATE; FORSTE, JOSEPH ARTHUR, Jr.; BOLIVAR-FORSTE, BRANDI AYRIEANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: Property: 516 Grant Terrace Taft, CA 93268/Returned Original Via In Pro Per Bin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without Prejudice as to Does 1 to 10 only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: As to Joseph Arthur Forste Jr, Brandi Ayrieann Bolivar-Forste

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: As to All Unknown Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Substituted Service as to Joseph Arthur Forste, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Personal Service as to Brandi Ayrieann Bolivar-Forste

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: WEST VALLEY REAL ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 516 GRANT TERRACE TAFT, CA 93268 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned Via In ProPer/Counter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less