This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 11:21:46 (UTC).

WEST VALLEY REAL ESTATE VS DODDS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/22/2015 WEST VALLEY REAL ESTATE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DODDS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0107

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEST VALLEY REAL ESTATE

Defendants

JOWERS, FAITH

DODDS, KENNETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: RE: Failure to proceed to Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • DocketWrit Returned and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: WEST VALLEY REAL ESTATE; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 202 B Street Taft, CA 93268; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against: DODDS, KENNETH; JOWERS, FAITH; Party: Names: WEST VALLEY REAL ESTATE; DODDS, KENNETH; JOWERS, FAITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: Property: 202 B Street Taft, CA 93268 Kern County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without Prejudice as to Does 1 to 10 only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: As to Kenneth Dodds and Faith Jowers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Substituted Service as to Kenneth Dodds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: As to Any Person Claiming any Right to Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Substituted Service as to Faith Jowers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: WEST VALLEY REAL ESTATE; Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 202 B Street Taft, CA 93268 Kern County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Comment: Returned via KCS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less