This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 10:02:16 (UTC).

WEST VALLEY REAL ESTATE VS CABALLERO-REYES, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/24/2015 WEST VALLEY REAL ESTATE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CABALLERO-REYES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillips, Craig G. and Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0007

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Phillips, Craig G.

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEST VALLEY REAL ESTATE

Defendants

MILAN-PONCE, LUCERITO

CABALLERO-REYES, FELIPE

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

MO- Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: Proof of Service filed 1/08/16; Parties Present Plaintiff: WEST VALLEY REAL ESTATE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Kern County/ Original Returned Via In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Returned Via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: As to: Felipe Caballeros-Reyes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: As to; Lucerito Milan-ponce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Uncontested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: WEST VALLEY REAL ESTATE; Awarded Against: CABALLERO-REYES, FELIPE; MILAN-PONCE, LUCERITO; Amount; Damages: $4,013.23; Costs: $135.00; Total: $4148.23; Party: Names: WEST VALLEY REAL ESTATE; CABALLERO-REYES, FELIPE; MILAN-PONCE, LUCERITO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • DocketExhibit(s) List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - MO- Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: Proof of Service filed 1/08/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: By Substituted Service as to Felipe Caballero-Reyes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: By Substituted Service as to Lucerito Milan-Ponce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: WEST VALLEY REAL ESTATE; Served: 12/04/2015; Served: 12/04/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less