This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/18/2023 at 09:58:04 (UTC).

WESCO DISTRIBUTION, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS PEAK POWER, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/01/2023 WESCO DISTRIBUTION, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PEAK POWER, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0619

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESCO DISTRIBUTION, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendants

NILSSON, DARRON LORN

HANDY, MARK STANTON

PEAK POWER, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIFFERD JOSEPH A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

03/01/2023: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

03/02/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

03/01/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Order to Show Cause

03/02/2023: Order to Show Cause

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

03/28/2023: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

03/28/2023: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

03/28/2023: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

03/28/2023: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Request for Dismissal (Partial)

04/07/2023: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

Request for Dismissal (Partial)

04/12/2023: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

Request For Entry of Default Not Entered

04/21/2023: Request For Entry of Default Not Entered

Request for Entry of Default Entered

04/24/2023: Request for Entry of Default Entered

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Entry of Default Entered; Comment: As to Peak Power, LLC, a California limited liability company; Mark Stanton Handy; Darron Lorn Nilsson on Complaint filed 3/01/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request For Entry of Default Not Entered; Comment: #1b incomplete, does not fully conform to the Complaint. #8 is missing signature/date as you checked f.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: * as to defendant THE WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, a South Dakota corporation, ONLY; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WESCO DISTRIBUTION, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: as to defendants Jason Bork and Gabriel Bork only; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WESCO DISTRIBUTION, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to THE WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, A SOUTH DAKOTA CORPORATION, via Personal service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Mark Stanton Handy, via Personal service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Darron Lorn Nilsson, via Personal service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to PEAK POWER, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, via Personal service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 6/15/2023 Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WESCO DISTRIBUTION, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WESCO DISTRIBUTION, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WESCO DISTRIBUTION, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less