Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:01:02 (UTC).

WERNHART ET AL VS CLARK ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 WERNHART filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CLARK. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1318

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WERNHART, JOHANN

WERNHART, INGE

Defendants

YATES, SAMANTHA

CLARK, WILLIAM F

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

9/1/15 Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Contested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: WERNHART, INGE; WERNHART, JOHANN; Judgment Amount: $4,500.00; Awarded Against: CLARK, WILLIAM F; YATES, SAMANTHA; Party: Names: WERNHART, INGE; WERNHART, JOHANN; CLARK, WILLIAM F; YATES, SAMANTHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Writ Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: county of kern

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • Notice of Stay of Proceeding (After Trial) - Comment: AS TO SAMANTHA YATES RETURNED VIA U.S. MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: KERN/ MONEY/ WES, RETURNED VIA TRI STAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • Authorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: Kassandra Wernhart

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • Mediation Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • Stipulated Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: per mediated agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Trial - 9/1/15 Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: PROOF OF MAILING SUB SERV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: SUB SERVICE TO SAMANTHA CLARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Authorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: KASSANDRA WERNHART FOR INGE AND JOHANN WERNHART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less