This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 03:44:23 (UTC).

WERNER PINEDA ET AL VS FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/28/2016 WERNER PINEDA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R., Clark, Thomas S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1473

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Clark, Thomas S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PINEDA, WERNER R.

PINEDA, YAZMIN

Defendants

FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SAN FERNANDO MOTOR COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA RYDELL CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MIKHOV, STEVE B

DAGHIGHIAN, SEPEHR

UNGS, LAUREN A

Defendant Attorneys

HOWARD, MARCY P

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Second rejection. Writ packet. Per phone call with Elin Howard on 1/30/2019, further research needed as to only one Judgment Debtor listed and total judgment amount listed on Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Costs. Notice of Levy form is for County Recorder use only. Duplicate filing of Declaration in support of Calculation on Interest Accrued. Declaration was filed 1/22/2019.

Ruling

Ruling 06/28/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 03:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Declaration and Order rejected. Fee of $20 is required. Returned via e-file

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 11/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 11/15/17 Filed by Steve Mikhov attorney for plaintiff PLAINTIFFS YAZMIN PINEDA AND WERNER R. PINEDA'S EX PARTE APPLICATION ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL; DECLARATION OF SEPEHR DAGHIGHIAN IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 10/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: J/T SET 11/20/17 9AM DEPT 11 T/E 4 TO 5 DAYS JURY FOR PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT AND FCMC SET 11/17/17 130PM DEPT 11

Ruling

Ruling 06/29/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: ruling on matter submitted on 06/16/17

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 06/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: to show cause why the court should not consolidate (1) BCV-16-102907 DR (2) BCV-16-102487 TSC (3) BCV-16-101526 TSC (4) BCV-16-100877 DRL (5) BCV-16-101360 TSC (6) BCV-16-101473 DRL for discovery and case management purposes including the appointment of a discovery referee for all cases

Ruling

MInute Order Dated 5-16-17: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

01/11/17 - M.O. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: HOWARD, MARCY P; Defendant; Attorney: HOWARD, MARCY P

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Declaration & Order: Missing $20.00 fee.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Declaration: Any request to move a hearing requires Judges approval and must have a proposed order for Judge to sign.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Duplicate of Notice of order to show cause re dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 08/31/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont'd from 07/13/18 to 08/31/18

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice:

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 07/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Motion for Fees - Pre-Disposition (CL/CV)

Motion for Fees - Pre-Disposition (CL/CV) 06/28/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 6/1/18 Plaintiffs, YAZMIN PINEDA and WERNER R. PINEDA Motion for Attorney's Fees, Costs and Expenses ResID: 31037

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Declaration and order rejected. 1.) Fee of $20 required. 2.) Pursuant to conversation with Darrel on 3/1/2018, dec and order rejected.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Please file a proposed order requesting the Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal to be rescheduled with the specified date.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction - Comment: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Minute Order dated 02/05/2019 addressed to LAUREN A UNGS returned to the court undelivered. Re-mailed to address as follows: 10250 Constellation Blvd., Suite 2500 Los Angeles, CA 90067

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Minute Order dated 02/05/2019 addressed to JENNIFER A KUENSTER returned to the court undelivered. Re-mailed to address as follows: 1 EMBARCADERO CTR STE 3200 SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94111

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Electronic Rejection Notice: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 02/05/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Declaration & Order: Missing $20.00 fee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Second rejection. Writ packet. Per phone call with Elin Howard on 1/30/2019, further research needed as to only one Judgment Debtor listed and total judgment amount listed on Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Costs. Notice of Levy form is for County Recorder use only. Duplicate filing of Declaration in support of Calculation on Interest Accrued. Declaration was filed 1/22/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Writ packet. Writ of Execution is missing page 2. Notice of Levy is a form for the use of the County Recorder only. Abstract of Judgment has Notice of Entry of Judgment and Order granting Plaintiffs Motion for Attorney fees attached, those are filed documents and must be kept for your records only. Please resubmit Abstract of Judgment only.

    Read MoreRead Less
117 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Defendant San Fernando Motor Company, a California Corporation DBA Rydell Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram's Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Defendant FCA US LLC's answer to complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • DocketService Copy / Coordination Proceeding

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY , PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO SAN FERNANDO MOTOR COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA RYDELL CHRYSLER DODGE JEPP RAM, SUB SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/12/16 Hearing Time: 08:30 Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 06/30/2016; Served: 07/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less