Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 05:34:29 (UTC).

WELLS VS WELLS (C)

Case Summary

On 08/11/2014 WELLS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WELLS C. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D., Fielder, John L., Stainfield, Bryan K. and Gill, Susan M.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9612

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Fielder, John L.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Gill, Susan M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WELLS, TRENT L.

Respondent

WELLS, DESSAMAE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MCATEE, FRED S, II

Respondent Attorney

SALMONSEN, EUGENE

Other Attorneys

MCATEE, FRED S

Attorney at LAW OFC FRED S MCATEE

1217 L St

Bakersfield, CA 93301

 

Court Documents

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 11/09/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT'D FROM 3/02/17, 5/04/17, 6/29/17 AND 8/31/17 **OSC CAL ALSO**

Motion for Sanctions

Mandatory Settlement Conference 06/29/2017: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: CONT'D FROM 3/02/17 AND 5/04/17 **MSC CAL ALSO**; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: MCATEE, FRED S, II

Motion for Sanctions

Motion for Sanctions 03/02/2017: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: CONTD FROM 1/5/17 **MSC CAL ALSO**; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: MCATEE, FRED S, II; Respondent; Attorney: SALMONSEN, EUGENE

Motion for Sanctions

1/5/17 MO - MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Continuance: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONT'D FROM 11/10/16 **MSC CAL ALSO**; Parties Present Petitioner: WELLS, TRENT L.; Attorney: MCATEE, FRED S, II; Respondent: WELLS, DESSAMAE; Attorney: SALMONSEN, EUGENE

Mandatory Settlement Conference

11/10/16 MO MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE/MOTION ON SANCTIONS: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: EST TIME 3 HRS CONT'D FROM 9/29/16; Parties Present Petitioner: WELLS, TRENT L.; Attorney: MCATEE, FRED S, II; Respondent: WELLS, DESSAMAE; Attorney: SALMONSEN, EUGENE

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 09/29/2016: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: TIME EST 3 HRS CONT FROM 8/18/16; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: MCATEE, FRED S, II

Mandatory Settlement Conference

04/21/16 MO: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONT FROM 2/25/16 EST TIME 3 HRS; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: MCATEE, FRED S, II

Mandatory Settlement Conference

**MO - Mandatory Settlement Conference: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: EST TIME 3 HRS; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: MCATEE, FRED S, II

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketAmended Judgment - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Comment: 8/9/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: DECLARATION OF FRED S MCATEE, ESQ RE: REQUEST TO ENTER AMENDED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Final Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: PETITIONERS FINAL CORRECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Final Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: CORRECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: New Attorney:

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2014
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: HRG: 11/3/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: RES HRG 11/3/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • DocketResponse - Comment: RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: resp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: resp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2014
  • Docket805L Pmt: New Suit - Family Law GC 70670(B) (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for WELLS, TRENT L. (PE-1). Received from WELLS, TRENT L., check no(s) 10969. Receipt #792930 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2014
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2014
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCATEE, FRED S, II