This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 15:19:08 (UTC).

WELLS VS CENTEX HOMES

Case Summary

On 02/19/2014 WELLS filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against CENTEX HOMES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Lampe, David R. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1357

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Lampe, David R.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WELLS, JOHNNY

BLOWERS, JAMES

BLOWERS, MARICRUZ

CONRIQUE, CARLOS

CONRIQUE, CARMEN

MCCOMBS, SHAKIRA

MCCOMBS, CLAY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CENTEX HOMES

CENTEX HOMES, A NEVADA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP

CENTEX REAL ESTATE CORP., A NEVADA CORPORATION

CENTEX REAL ESTATE CORPORATION, , A NEVADA CORPORATION

CENTEX REAL ESTATE CORPORATION, A NEVADA CORPORATION

Cross Defendants

PETERSEN-DEAN, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WESTERN SHOWER DOOR, INC,, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BLUE MOUNTAIN CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, FORMERLY KNOWN AS BLUE MOUNTAIN AIR

OLYMPIC MILLWORK, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS AS DOORWAY MFG. CO.

ESTATE LANDSCAPING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MATHEW THOMAS YOUNGER, DOING BUSINESS AS ALPHA DOORS & FINISH CO., A SOLE OWNERSHIP

TRI-VALLEY PLASTERING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Not Classified By Court

HON. JONATHAN H. CANNON, SPECIAL MASTER

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GLADSTEIN, AARON M

Attorney at MILSTEIN ADELMAN LLP

2800 Donald Douglas Loop N

Santa Monica, CA 90405

CASTANEDA, MARC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

McSHERRY, KEVIN S.

RANDHAWA, AMTOJ S.

VICKERS, THERESE A

Cross Defendant Attorneys

GORMAN, PATRICK J

LETOFSKY, LARRY D

Other Attorneys

LAMARRA, KEITH N

LUHRING, SUSAN E

KITCHEN, CYNTHIA A

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Wallace Hammons Document: Answer to Cross-Complaint Must comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.350(d).

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of Service- Party served is not a party to action.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: George Milionis Document: Answer to Cross-Complaint of Petersen-Dean, Inc. Must comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.350(d).

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Lisa Lawrence Document: Cross-Complaint of Penney Lawn Service, Inc. and Summons to Cross-Complaint Case captions must be listed in their entirety, include all cross-complaints and their cross-defendants as well. Summons does not conform to your cross-complaint.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Lisa Lawrence Document: (SIMAS FLOORING, CO) Cross-Complaint and Summons on Cross-Complaint Case captioin must list all parties in their entirety. Please include each cross-complaint and their cross-defendants in the caption as well.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE: AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT. RETURNED VIA FIRST LEGAL.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of Service. Cross-Defendant is not named in the First Amended Cross-Complaint/Summons.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: SUMMONS TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT RETURNED VIA E-FILE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: To: Amtoj S. Randhawa Document: Summons to First Amended Cross-Complaint Summons does not conform. Must comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.350(d).

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: Request for Dismissal - Name and Filing date of Cross-Complaint/Cross-Complainant doesn't conform

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: To: Todd D. Bromgard Document: Answer to First Amended Cross-Complaint of Centex Homes and Centex Real Estate Company, LLC Default has been entered on cross-defendant as of 3/27/2018.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT. MUST HAVE DESIGNATED AREA FOR JUDICIAL OFFICER'S SIGNATURE. RETURNED VIA E-FILE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE: CHECK IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,000.00. COMPLEX CAP HAS BEEN MET. RETURNED VIA FIRST LEGAL

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND TO PERMIT ANSWER TO BE FILED

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT. RETURNED VIA E-FILE

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Susan Luhring Document: Answer to Cross-Complaint Cross-Defendant's name does not conform to the cross-complaint. If party was erroneously sued please note that on your response.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: TO AMTOJ RANDHAWA: REJECTING REQUEST FOR DEFAULT. NO PROOF OF SERVICE ON FILE WITH COURT AS TO BROWN ENTERPRISES, a California partnership, doing business as FLAMECO FIREPLACE SPECIALISTS.

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 03/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: stay lifted 10-28-17

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Unable to forward - No addess provided

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Other Court-Ordered Dism Before Trial (CS/PB)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketOrder Dismissing Action (Full) - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - Further Case Management Conference 10/02/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont status of Complaints in Intervention still pending.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without Prejudice as to Centex Real Estate Company, LLC's Cross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Continuance - Comment: Notice of Continued CMC/Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - Further Case Management Conference 07/31/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Status of Settlement with one Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Antoj Randhawa For: Request for Dismissal Reason: Duplicate filing. Dismissal previously filed on 6/10/19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to the Cross-Complaint of Centex Homes - ONLY - Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: and Proof of Service - Turman Construction

    Read MoreRead Less
436 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2014
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: FILED BY AARON M. GLADSTEIN, ESQ CMC 4/18/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint - Comment: FILED BY PLTF BY A. GLADSTEIN ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference - Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO EACH PARTY AND THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY THE HONORABLE [~PERSON:CALJUDGENAME], ON 4/18/2014 AT 8:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 4, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF KERN. APPEARANCE BY THE ATTORNEY RESPONSIBLE FOR THE TRIAL OF THIS ACTION IS MANDATORY. NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: You are required to serve this Notice of Case Management Conference date with the service of the Summons, Complaint (Local Rule 3.7(a)), ADR Information Packet, Civil Mediation Information Brochure, and ADR Stipulation and Order Form. [CRC, Rule 3.221] NOTICE TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: If you are bringing a cross complaint against new parties, you are, likewise, required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date on the new cross defendants. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO EACH PARTY AND THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY THE HONORABLE SIDNEY P CHAPIN, ON 4/18/2014 AT 8:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 4, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF KERN. APPEARANCE BY THE ATTORNEY RESPONSIBLE FOR THE TRIAL OF THIS ACTION IS MANDATORY. NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: You are required to serve this Notice of Case Management Conference date with the service of the Summons, Complaint (Local Rule 3.7(a)), ADR Information Packet, Civil Mediation Information Brochure, and ADR Stipulation and Order Form. [CRC, Rule 3.221] NOTICE TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: If you are bringing a cross complaint against new parties, you are, likewise, required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date on the new cross defendants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: Amount of $1,000.00 for WELLS, JOHNNY (PL-1). Received from ONE LEGAL LLC, check no(s) 334266. Receipt #765882 for amount of $1,000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • Docket800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for WELLS, JOHNNY (PL-1). Received from ONE LEGAL LLC, check no(s) 3342241. Receipt #765880 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jun 04, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jun 04, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY AARON M. GLADSTEIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY AARON M. GLADSTEIN CMC SET 8:00AM DEPT 4

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRI-VALLEY PLASTERING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where OLYMPIC MILLWORK INC; DBA : DOORWAY MFG CO is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTEX REAL ESTATE COMPANY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PETERSEN-DEAN INC is a litigant