This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/11/2021 at 16:05:25 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO VS BROWN

Case Summary

On 03/03/2010 WELLS FARGO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BROWN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7147

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK

Defendants

BROWN, CHEI K

BROWN, RUFUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ESTELA DE ORDUNO, MARIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2010
  • Docket172D Pmt: Motion/Stip/OSC/Demurrer GC 70617(A) - Comment: Amount of $40.00 for WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO WE... (PL-1). Received from SUPPA,TRUCCHI&HENEIN,LLP, check no(s) 27278. Receipt #553117 for amount of $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • DocketOrder Vacating Judgment - Comment: ENTERED ON JULY 12, 2010 IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK AND AGAINST DEFENDANT IS HEREBY VACTED, AND THIS ACTION IS HEREBY DISMISSED IN ITS ENTIRETY WITHOUT PREJUDICE ETIENNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2010
  • Docket4183 Order to Show Cause - (N23d - CRC 3.740(d)) - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2010
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF SAMY S. HENEIN RE REQUEST FOR ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT AND FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED BY SAMMY S. HENEIN, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2010
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Vacated - Default Judgment Entered - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2010
  • DocketJudgment - Comment: JUDGMENT FOR: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK JUDGMENT AGAINST: CHEI K. BROWN, RUFUS BROWN PRINCIPLE/DAMAGES: $7733.01 INTEREST: $1266.94 ATTORNEY FEES: $1409.95 COSTS: $300.00 TOTAL: $ 10,709.90 ETIENNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2010
  • DocketDeclaration and Order - Comment: OF CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS RE MISSING ORIGINAL AGREEMENT; ORDER THEREON IT IS SO ORDERED. COMMISSIONER ETIENNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2010
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDJGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT CCP 585D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2010
  • DocketRequest for Court Judgment - Comment: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFT:CHEI K BROWN, RUFUS BROWN COMPLAINT FILED:3/3/10 FILED BY:MARIA ESTELA DE ORDUNA ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2010
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default - Comment: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFT:CHEI K BROWN, RUFUS BROWN COMPLAINT FILED:3/3/10 FILED BY:MARIA ESTELA DE ORDUNA ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2010
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE DOES 1 TO 20 FILED BY MARIA ESTELA DE ORDUNA ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Vacated - Proof of Service Filed - Comment: 09/14/10 OSC HEARING VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; VERIFICATION OF VENUE; ADR PACKET WHO SERVED: RUFUS BROWN HOW SERVED: SUBSTITUTED DATE SERVED: 04/28/10 SERVICE FEES: $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; VERIFICATION OF VENUE; ADR PACKET WHO SERVED: CHEI K. BROWN HOW SERVED: SUBSTITUTED DATE SERVED: 04/28/10 SERVICE FEES: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 01, 2011 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 14 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 01, 2011 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 14 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 14, 2010 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 14 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 14, 2010 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 14 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2010
  • Docket843W Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) (7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $205.00 for WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK (PL-1). Received from SUPPA, TRUCCHI & HENEIN, LLP, check no(s) 23395. Receipt #511786 for amount of $205.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2010
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 432

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2010
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2010
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: MARIA ESTELA DE ORDUNA, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUPPA, TRUCCHI & HENEIN, LLP - MARIA ESTELA DE ORDUNA ESQ