This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/03/2021 at 13:18:37 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO V. WATSON

Case Summary

On 05/08/2009 WELLS FARGO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WATSON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8935

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK, A SOUTH DAKOTA STATE CHARTERED BANK

Defendant

WATSON, MATTHEW A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ESTELA DE ORDUNO, MARIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2015
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction - Comment: As to Matthew A Watson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Return on Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • Docket115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK, A SOUTH DAKOTA STAT... (PL-1). Received from SUPPA TRUCCHI & HENEIN, LLP, check no(s) 35536. Receipt #771881 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: LOS ANGELES/RETURNED ORIGINAL VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • DocketMemo of Costs / Accrued Interest - Comment: RETURNED ENDORSED COPY VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2012
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • Docket115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK, A SOUTH DAKOTA STAT... (PL-1). Received from SUPPA,TRUCCHI & HENEIN, check no(s) 31506. Receipt #599227 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: TO VENTURA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2009
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DOES 1 TO 20 ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2009
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Court Entered - Comment: RE: MATTHEW A. WATSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2009
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Vacated - Proof of Service Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2009
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: RE: MATTHEW A WATSON COST: $79.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2009
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON May 03, 2010 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT ATOF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2009
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Nov 02, 2009 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AT OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2009
  • Docket843T Pmt: Ltd Civil First Appearance < $10,000 GC 70614(B) - Comment: Amount of $200.00 for WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK, A SOUTH DAKOTA STATE CHARTERED BANK (PL-1). Received from SUPS, TRUCCHI & HENEIN, check no(s) 14808. Receipt #455556 for amount of $200.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2009
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2009
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2009
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: donnas2

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUPPA, TRUCCHI & HENEIN, LLP - MARIA ESTELA DE ORDUNA ESQ