This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:10:39 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS STANLEY M ANDERSON AKA STAN M ANDERSON ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STANLEY M ANDERSON AKA STAN M ANDERSON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2285

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

STANLEY M ANDERSON AKA STAN M ANDERSON

STANLEY M ANDERSON AND BRENDA S ANDERSON, TRUSTEES OF ANDERSON FAMILY TRUST

ANDERSON, BRENDA S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REYNOLDS, ROGER D

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 05/20/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: /Status conference notice of settlement field

Ruling

Ruling 03/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/16/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 05/20/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: status conferenceRE: notice of settlement and entry of judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 05/20/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: /Status conference notice of settlement field

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketOpposition - Comment: to Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal on Settled Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 5/20/19 Notice of OSC Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Case Management Conference 05/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement - Conditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Entry of Order re: Certificate of Inability to Respond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketRuling/Certificate of Inability - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: The Court, having reviewed the foregoing, hereby GRANTS Defendants an extension of up to and including March 31, 2018, in which to respond to the Complaint. The Case Management Conference set on April 2, 2018, at 8:15 a.m. in Department 17 is continued to May 17, 2018, at 8:15 in Department 17. ****JUDGE STEPHEN D. SCHUETT****3/29/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Inability to Respond

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketRuling/Certificate of Inability - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: RE; CERTIFICATE OF INABILITY FILED 11/8/17 RULING; EXTENSION GRANTED RESPONSIVE PLEADING SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 12/11/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Inability to Respond - Comment: REQUESTING A 30 DAY EXTENSION TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/16/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/09/2017; Served: 10/09/2017; Served: 10/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.