This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 10:46:15 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. VS NASE

Case Summary

On 10/05/2016 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NASE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S., Brumfield, Lorna H. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2353

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Defendant

NASE, DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUKAI, JEFFERY K

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Abstract of Judgment. Judgment has not been entered. Returned via e-file

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Proposed judgment rejected:Please provide service on defendant on proposed judgment. returned via efile

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Abstract of Judgment

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Notice of Lodging Proposed Order and Judgment; Proposed Order; Judgment rejected in File and Serve

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ABSTRACT

Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication

Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication 01/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 10/13/17 Plaintiff, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to CCP 437C, or in the alternative, Summary Adjudication pursuant to CCP 437C(f) ResID: 27096

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 07/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: MOVING PARTY - WELLS FARGO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO DISMISS CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO FILED AMENDED COMPLAINT DATE - 07/27/17 TIME - 8:30AM DEPARTMENT 17

Further Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Further Hearing - Pre-Disposition 07/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CMC

Demurrer

Demurrer 06/15/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 5/17/17, by Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant, Wells Fargo Bank. Demurrer to Cross-Complaint. ResID: 24766

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 06/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT & SUMMONS: MISSING PROOF OF SERVICE. NO CROSS COMPLAINT ON FILE TO AMEND. MUST FILE AN INITIAL CROSS-COMPLAINT FIRST.

Demurrer

Demurrer 03/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 2/3/17 Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. Demurrer to Daniel Nase's Answer and Cross-Complaint ResID: 23888; Parties Present Defendant: NASE, DANIEL

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: re; responses returned pro per "N"

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Summary Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketJudgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: On January 19, 201 8, this Court granted Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, NA. ("Plaintiff') Motion for Summary Judgment against Defendant Daniel Nase, an individual ("Defendant"). In accordance with that decision, it is hereby adj udged, ordered, and decreed that Defendant is indebted t0 Plaintiff the principal sum 0f $50,535.98 plus court costs in the sum 0f $1 ,020.00 for a total judgment 0f$51,555.98.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Abstract of Judgment. Judgment has not been entered. Returned via e-file

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Proposed judgment rejected:Please provide service on defendant on proposed judgment. returned via efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Notice of Lodging Proposed Order and Judgment; Proposed Order; Judgment rejected in File and Serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ABSTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 2 days

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: ANSWER: DOCUMENTS CANNOT BE DOUBLE SIDED. MUST COMPLY WITH CRC 2.111

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: ANSWER: MUST COMPLY TO CCP 2.111 AS TO FORM & FORMAT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • DocketNotice of Assignment / Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: and OSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/19/17 Hearing Time: 08:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/30/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less