This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/27/2022 at 08:14:20 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. VS MISTY D. ARMENDARIZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MISTY D ARMENDARIZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1654

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Defendants

MISTY D. ARMENDARIZ

SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIKA BRANDON J

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment

03/26/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Mail Returned Undelivered

03/12/2021: Mail Returned Undelivered

Judgment by Default by Court

03/03/2021: Judgment by Default by Court

Proof of Service by Mail

03/03/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Points and Authorities

03/03/2021: Points and Authorities

Request

03/03/2021: Request

Request for Court Judgment

03/03/2021: Request for Court Judgment

Declaration

03/03/2021: Declaration

Request for Judicial Notice

03/03/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

10/16/2020: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Declaration

10/07/2020: Declaration

Proof of Service by Mail

10/07/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration

10/07/2020: Declaration

Notice of Lis Pendens

10/05/2020: Notice of Lis Pendens

Order to Show Cause

07/17/2020: Order to Show Cause

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

07/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

07/17/2020: Summons Issued and Filed

Complaint

07/16/2020: Complaint

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Entry of Judgment; Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Mail Returned Undelivered; Comment: 1/12/21 Stipulation and Order addressedt o Brandon J Mika

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Judgment by Default by Court; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service by Mail; Comment: Proof of Service by Mail; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Points and Authorities; Comment: Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request; Comment: Request for Waiver of Live Testimony; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Court Judgment; Comment: As to Misty D. Armendariz fka Misty D. Letsch on Complaint filed 7/16/20; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: Declaration in Support of Judgment; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Judicial Notice; Comment: Request for Judicial Notice; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: (Clerical error no Rejection needed called Attorney to resubmit filing) Judgmen packet- Party has not been Defaulted unable to process Request for Court Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: in response to order to show cause re: service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Misty S. Armendariz fka Misty D. Letsch: Personal Service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: of Due Diligence. As to Misty D. Armendariz fka Misty D. Letsch. 3 attempts; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service by Mail; Comment: Notice of Assignment to Judge for all Purposes and Notice of Order to Show Cause Re CRC Rule 3.110 and Notice of Case Management Conference. As to Secretary of the Housing and Urban Development.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: of Due Diligence. As to Misty D. Armendariz FKA Misty D Letsch. 4 attempts; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Lis Pendens; Comment: of action; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: CRC 3.110Hearing Date: 10/30/20Hearing Time: 8:30Hearing Department/Division: 11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Secretary of Housing and Urban Development is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIKA BRANDON J