This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:51:38 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. VS GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1481

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Defendant

GONZALEZ, CARMELA R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VELEN, ANGELA A

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d):

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction - Comment: Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d): Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d): Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Stipulated Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.; Awarded Against: GONZALEZ, CARMELA R; Amount; Damages: $5,160.68; Costs: $310.00; Total: $5470.68

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketStipulated Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketStipulation - Comment: Stipulation for entry of judgment & proposed judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: As to Carmela R. Gonzalez. Personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 03/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.