This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:48:08 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. VS DURAN

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DURAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5741

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Defendant

DURAN, LUIS F

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLANDA, JON O

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 04/25/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Cont'd from 04/25/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 04/25/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less