This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/10/2021 at 19:18:18 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. VS BONILLA

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BONILLA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4454

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Defendant

BONILLA, JOSE RENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KERFAN, HANNA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 05/03/2021: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: as to Jose Rene Bonilla, 5 attempts.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketAffidavit - Comment: of Unsuccessful Service as to Jose Rene Bonilla, 5 attempts.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant