Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/03/2021 at 19:32:13 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. VS AMARO

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMARO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4495

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Defendants

AMARO, JANET

AMARO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KERFAN, HANNA

 

Court Documents

Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition)

Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition) 05/26/2021: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 3/30/2021 Plaintiff, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. Motion for Order Deeming the Truth of Matters Specified in Plaintiff's Request for Admissions as Admitted cont'd from 05/05/21

Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition)

Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition) 05/05/2021: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 3/30/2021 Plaintiff, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. Motion for Order Deeming the Truth of Matters Specified in Plaintiff's Request for Admissions as Admitted

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: to compel initial responses to plaintiff's discovery: request for admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Order (Pre-Disposition) - Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition) 05/26/2021: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 3/30/2021 Plaintiff, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. Motion for Order Deeming the Truth of Matters Specified in Plaintiff's Request for Admissions as Admitted cont'd from 05/05/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of non appearance at motion hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketOpposition - Comment: to Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Order (Pre-Disposition) - Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition) 05/05/2021: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 3/30/2021 Plaintiff, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. Motion for Order Deeming the Truth of Matters Specified in Plaintiff's Request for Admissions as Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lodging - Comment: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: Re: Motion for an Order Deeming the Truth of the Matters Specified in Plaintiff's Request for Admissions as Admitted Hearing Date: 5/5/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketAffidavit - Comment: of Unsuccessful Service, as to Janet Amaro, 5 attempts.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 12/14/20201:02 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KERFAN HANNA