This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 05:19:34 (UTC).

WEEDPATCH INVESTMENT GROUP VS MORALES, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/16/2015 WEEDPATCH INVESTMENT GROUP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MORALES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Witt, Gary R., Phillips, Craig G., Staley, H.A. "Skip" and Staley, H. A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0033

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Witt, Gary R.

Phillips, Craig G.

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

Staley, H. A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEEDPATCH INVESTMENT GROUP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

MORALES, MARTIN CRUZ

MURILLO, ERENDIRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARROLL, JOSEPH W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Without Prejudice As To Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: Answer filed by Erendira Murillo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • DocketNotice of Trial - Comment: 9/17/2015 at 1:30 PM Dept: A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • DocketRequest/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: As to Martin Cruz Morales

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: As to All Unknown Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Personal Service as to Martin Cruz Morales

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketAnswer - Comment: To Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: WEEDPATCH INVESTMENT GROUP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP; Served: 08/01/2015; Served: 08/01/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 12360 MAIN STREET, #29 LAMONT, CA 93241 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less