This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 21:58:55 (UTC).

WEAVER VS STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/15/2016 WEAVER filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Lampe, David R., Clark, Thomas S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0845

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Lampe, David R.

Clark, Thomas S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JET LANDSCAPING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KADEN WEAVER, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, JESSICA HATTON

KELLAN WEAVER, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM ANDREA OSUNA

LONNIE THOMAS, INDIVIDUALLY, AND DBA JET LANDSCAPING AND GARDENING

Defendants

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

RAMONA HERRERA, INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS AN AGENT AND EMPLOYEE OF STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

HERRERA, RAMONA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NICHOLS, STEVE W

Defendant Attorney

HAYES, STEPHEN M

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Minor's Compromise

Minor's Compromise 04/12/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: AS TO MINOR KADEN WEAVER

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 09/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Set per stipulation signed 8/15/2017; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: NICHOLS, STEVE W; Plaintiff; Attorney: NICHOLS, STEVE W; Plaintiff; Attorney: NICHOLS, STEVE W; Plaintiff; Attorney: NICHOLS, STEVE W

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS. DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT. PLAINTIFFS ARE NOT LISTED ON THE SUMMONS AS THEY ARE ON THE COMPLAINT.

Ruling

Ruling 05/22/2017: Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

05/03/2017 MO: 3 Motion to Compel: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 3/30/17 Defendants, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY and RAMONA HERRERA Motion to Compel Lonnie Thomas, Individually and DBA Jet Landscaping and Gardening to Provide Further Responses to Requests for Production of Documents, Set One ResID: 24361 *********************************************** TENTATIVE: GRANT MOTION. ************************************************; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: NICHOLS, STEVE W; Plaintiff; Attorney: NICHOLS, STEVE W; Plaintiff; Attorney: NICHOLS, STEVE W; Plaintiff; Attorney: NICHOLS, STEVE W

Ruling

Ruling 04/27/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 10/17/2016: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: NICHOLS, STEVE W; Plaintiff; Attorney: NICHOLS, STEVE W; Plaintiff; Attorney: NICHOLS, STEVE W; Plaintiff; Attorney: NICHOLS, STEVE W

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: T/E 10 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: Jury Trial 07/16/18; T/E 10 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: WHY MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: T/E 10 DAYS (D-4) FCMC 7/06/18 TD 7/16/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: 3/26/18 Defendant, RAMONA HERRERA Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Adjudication ResID: 29468

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketLetter Received - Comment: Letter to Court Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money - Comment: in Blocked Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money - Comment: in Blocked Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to State Farm General Insurance Company personal service 5/9/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Served: 05/04/20162:10 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Ramona Herrera personally served 5/4/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: No copies provided.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2016
  • DocketApplication & Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: Applicant: Andrea Osuna Claimant: Kallan Weaver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2016
  • DocketApplication & Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: Applicant: Jessica Hatton Claimant: Kaden Weaver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: SUMMONS CANNOT BE ISSUED WITH NO GUARDIAN AD LITEMS ON FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 8/02/16 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAYES STEPHEN MICHAEL