This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/09/2020 at 06:06:50 (UTC).

WASCO ARMS APARTMENTS VS THALMAN

Case Summary

On 03/16/2009 WASCO ARMS APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against THALMAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7122

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WASCO ARMS APARTMENTS, LP

Defendant

THALMAN, SHERRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS, CHRIS J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2009
  • Docket134A Pmt: Photocopy GC 70627(A) EFF 1/1/06 - Comment: Amount of $1.00 for WASCO ARMS APARTMENTS, LP (PL-1). Received from ATTORNEY'S CERTIFIED SERVICES, check no(s) 4446. Receipt #461988 for amount of $1.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2009
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2009
  • Docket115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 - Comment: Amount of $15.00 for WASCO ARMS APARTMENTS, LP (PL-1). Received from KIMBALL, TIREY & ST JOHN, check no(s) 80197. Receipt #452023 for amount of $15.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2009
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: TO KERN COUNTY NO LOCKOUT PRIOR TO 05/05/09 AT 5:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2009
  • DocketStipulated Judgment - Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION TO ISSUE. NO LOCKOUT PRIOR TO 05/05/09 AT 5:00 PM JUDGE ROBERT S TAFOYA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2009
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2009
  • DocketNP1500 - Comment: Department: BS Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: MAXINE DE VILLEFRANCHE APPEARS FOR CHRIS J EVANS. SHERRY THALMAN (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. PARTIES HAVE REACHED AN AGREEMENT/STIPULATION. DEFENDANT TO PAY $198.00 FOR UNPAID RENT (11/1/08 - 4/30/09). PLAINTIFF WILL WAIVE ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS OF SUIT. DEFENDANT MUST VACATE THE APARTMENT BY MAY 5, 2009 AT 5:00 P.M. WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH BUT THERE WILL BE NO LOCK-OUT PRIOR TO MAY 5TH. DEFENDANT ALSO AGREES NOT TO RETALIATE AND/OR CAUSE PROBLEMS WITH PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2009
  • Docket4151 Unlawful Detainer Trial - (N6a) - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2009
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court); Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2009
  • DocketNotice of Trial - Comment: NOTICE OF TRIAL CAUSE SET FOR TRIAL ON Apr 14, 2009 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT BS, OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF KERN. THE CASE WILL BE CALLED PROMPTLY AT THE SCHEDULED TIME.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2009
  • Docket134A Pmt: Photocopy GC 70627(A) EFF 1/1/06 - Comment: Amount of $1.50 for WASCO ARMS APARTMENTS, LP (PL-1). Received from ATTORNEY'S CERTIFIED SERVICES, check no(s) 4326. Receipt #447393 for amount of $1.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2009
  • DocketRequest/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD) - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2009
  • DocketAnswer (Verified) - Comment: AS TO SHERRY THALMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2009
  • DocketOrder on Application for Waiver of Fees - Comment: GRANTED IN PART BY CLERK. ALL FEES WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2009
  • DocketApplication for Waiver of Fee - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL AIDE WILL NOW CONDUCT TENANTS' RIGHTS CLINICS ON THE FOLLOWING DAYS ONLY EVERY TUESDAY AND THURSDAY AT 10 A.M. IN THE SELF HELP CENTER LOCATED ON THE 3RD FLOOR AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CALL THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL AIDE AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CALL CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA. 93215. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL AIDE WILL NOW CONDUCT TENANTS' RIGHTS CLINICS ON THE FOLLOWING DAYS ONLY EVERY TUESDAY AND THURSDAY AT 10 A.M. IN THE SELF HELP CENTER LOCATED ON THE 3RD FLOOR AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CALL THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL AIDE AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CALL CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA. 93215.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • Docket841G Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee < $10,000 GC 70613(B) CCP - Comment: Amount of $215.00 for WASCO ARMS APARTMENTS, LP (PL-1). Received from KIMBALL, TIREY & ST JOHN, LLP, check no(s) 78955. Receipt #444935 for amount of $215.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: marlyng

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WASCO ARMS APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EVANS CHRIS