Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2016 at 18:31:22 (UTC).

WARDELL VS ALVAREZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 WARDELL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALVAREZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0872

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WARDELL, MELINDA

Defendants

ALVAREZ, AMILCAR

RHOTEN, STALICA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2015
  • Order Dismissing Action (Full) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - 10/7/15 Minute Order - Order to Show Cause (Local Rule 3.15) Document, Judicial Officer(s): Copelan, James B., Etienne, Linda S., Hearing Time: 1:30 PM, Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Rejection returned via mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: WARDELL, MELINDA, Person to Serve: ALVAREZ, AMILCAR, Unserved, Person to Serve: RHOTEN, STALICA, Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 3320 Shellmacher Ave Bakersfield, CA 93304

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned at counter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment: In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less