Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 18:58:41 (UTC).

Ward VS Ward

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 Ward filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Ward. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K. and Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0087

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ward, Charlene

Respondent

Ward, Justin

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Petitioner

MINUTE ORDER 08/24/15: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: Ward, Charlene; Respondent: Ward, Justin

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2016
  • Child Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • Declaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • Mediation Agreement and Order - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • Mediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - MINUTE ORDER 08/24/15: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: Ward, Charlene; Respondent: Ward, Justin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Request for Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less