This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/03/2020 at 07:38:50 (UTC).

WARD VS HAAHEIM, ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/12/2003 WARD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HAAHEIM,. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4137

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WARD, RITA F

Defendant

HAAHEIM, WANDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VINING, SHERI CONNELLY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2003
  • DocketWrit of Possession - Comment: ISSUED FOR KERN COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2003
  • Docket115 Pmt: Writs Issued GC 26828 - Comment: Amount of $7.00 for WARD, RITA F (PL-1). Received from SHERI VINING, check no(s) 13485. Receipt #43646 for amount of $7.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2003
  • DocketJudgment After Hearing - Comment: FILED BY COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF - SHERI VINING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2003
  • DocketNP1500 - Comment: Department: BL Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: STIPULATION RE: JUDGE PRO TEMPORE FILED AND INCORPORATED HEREIN BY REFERENCE. RITA F WARD (PL-1) APPEARS BY SHERI CONNELLY VINING. PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. NO APPEARANCE BY WANDA HAAHEIM JUDGMENT FOR RITA WARD, AGAINST WANDA HAAHEIM, RENT/RENTAL DAMAGES $7259.98, COSTS $154.30, ATTORNEY FEES $450.00, MISC FEES $ FOR A TOTAL OF $7864.28. ELECTRONIC RECORDING NUMBER(S):474B/550 & 474B/4586.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2003
  • Docket4151 Unlawful Detainer Trial - (N6a) - Comment: New Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2003
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Comment: COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF REQUESTED THIS DATE FOR HEARING.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2003
  • DocketOriginal Summons Returned - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2003
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: WHAT: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER); PREJUDGMENT CLAIM TO RIGHT OF POSSESSION; STATEMENT OF CLASSIFICATION AND LOCATION; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET WHO: ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS HOW: BY LEAVING COPIES WITH A COMPETENT MEMBER OF THE HOUSEHOLD WHEN: 06/23/03

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2003
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: WHAT: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER; STATEMENT OF CLASSIFICATION AND LOCATION; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET WHO: WANDA HAAHEIM HOW: PERSONAL SERVICE BY PROCESS SERVER WHEN: 06/23/03

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2003
  • DocketAt Issue Court Trial >1 Day - Comment: New Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2003
  • DocketNotice of Trial - Comment: New Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2003
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 238

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2003
  • DocketMemorandum to Set Court Trial Filed - Comment: REGARDING UNLAWFUL DETAINER, REQUESTED BY COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2003
  • DocketSee Civil Management Register of Actions for Events Prior to - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VINING, SHERI CONNELLY