This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/26/2019 at 11:19:03 (UTC).

WALTER VS WALTER

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 WALTER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WALTER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Webster, Jason W. and Pritchard, Kenneth G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0329

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Webster, Jason W.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WALTER, SCOTT D

Respondent

WALTER, SOPHIA K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STEIN, ROGER I

Respondent Attorneys

SCHUSTER, DENNIS M

SILVA, WAYNE

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 06/27/2018: Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: WALTER, SCOTT D; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I; Respondent; Attorney: SILVA, WAYNE

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 02/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: WALTER, SCOTT D; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I; Respondent: WALTER, SOPHIA K

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Confirmation of Special Setting

Request for Order - Petitioner 02/14/2018: Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 02/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: WALTER, SCOTT D; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I; Respondent: WALTER, SOPHIA K

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 05/25/2018: Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: WALTER, SCOTT D; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I; Respondent: WALTER, SOPHIA K

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 11/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: WALTER, SCOTT D; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I; Respondent: WALTER, SOPHIA K; Attorney: SCHUSTER, DENNIS M

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 08/22/2018: Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Parties Present Petitioner: WALTER, SCOTT D; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I; Respondent: WALTER, SOPHIA K; Attorney: SILVA, WAYNE

Confirmation of Special Setting

Confirmation of Special Setting 10/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I; Respondent; Attorney: SILVA, WAYNE

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 09/05/2018: Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: WALTER, SCOTT D; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I; Respondent: WALTER, SOPHIA K; Attorney: SILVA, WAYNE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 10/23/2018: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: WALTER, SCOTT D; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I; Respondent: WALTER, SOPHIA K; Attorney: SILVA, WAYNE

Review

Review 07/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: WALTER, SCOTT D; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I; Respondent: WALTER, SOPHIA K; Attorney: SILVA, WAYNE

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 08/08/2018: Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: WALTER, SCOTT D; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I; Respondent: WALTER, SOPHIA K; Attorney: SILVA, WAYNE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 10/10/2018: Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: WALTER, SCOTT D; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I; Respondent: WALTER, SOPHIA K; Attorney: SILVA, WAYNE

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: WALTER, SCOTT D; WALTER, SOPHIA K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Judgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Comment: STATUS DATE 2/28/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Declaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Review - Review 02/27/2019: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: WALTER, SCOTT D; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I; Respondent: WALTER, SOPHIA K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Appearance Stipulation and Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Review - Review 02/20/2019: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Review - Review 02/13/2019: Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I

    Read MoreRead Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2017
  • Findings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Comment: HEARING DATE 11/1/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Response

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 11/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: WALTER, SCOTT D; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I; Respondent: WALTER, SOPHIA K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Mediation Appointment - Original Type: Mediation Appointment; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Responsive Declaration - Comment: TO REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED ON DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Request for Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.