This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 12:08:05 (UTC).

WALTER MODLER, III VS FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 WALTER MODLER, III filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brumfield, Lorna H., Clark, Thomas S., Lampe, David R. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2487

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Clark, Thomas S.

Lampe, David R.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MODLER, WALTER M., III

Defendants

FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MIKHOV, STEVE B

DAGHIGHIAN, SEPEHR

Defendant Attorneys

SHEPARDSON, SCOTT S.

SUAREZ, JEANETTE CATUIRA

 

Court Documents

Trial Setting Conference

Trial Setting Conference 02/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: TO SET NEW TRIAL DATES

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel 01/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/17/18 Defendant, FCA US LLC Motion to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff and Production of Vehicle for Inspection ResID: 28881

Ruling

Ruling 01/22/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Case Management Statement rejected in File and Serve

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 01/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FILED 1/5/2018 FILED BY AMY MORSE, ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE FOR AN ORDER SPECIALLY SETTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION ATTENDANCE AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY DEFENDANT FCA US LLC'S PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE AND DEALERSHIP PERSONNEL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE AN ORDER COMPELLING THE DEPOSITIONS GO FORWARD

Ruling

Ruling 06/29/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: ruling on matter submitted on 06/16/17

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 06/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: to show cause why the court should not consolidate (1) BCV-16-102907 DR (2) BCV-16-102487 TSC (3) BCV-16-101526 TSC (4) BCV-16-100877 DRL (5) BCV-16-101360 TSC (6) BCV-16-101473 DRL for discovery and case management purposes including the appointment of a discovery referee for all cases; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: SUAREZ, JEANETTE CATUIRA

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 5-16-17: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/02/17 Hearing Time: 08:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

Ruling

Ruling 03/18/2020: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 01/13/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Pursuant to CRC 3.1385

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Kristina Stephenson-Cheang Re: (Proposed) Judgment Reason: Judgment contains two proof of service. Resubmit with correct one

Motion to Tax Costs

Motion to Tax Costs 12/06/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 11/4/19 Defendant, FCA US LLC Motion to Tax Costs of Plaintiff ResID: 36293

Ruling

Ruling 11/14/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 03:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Motion for Fees - Pre-Disposition (CL/CV)

Motion for Fees - Pre-Disposition (CL/CV) 11/13/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 10/15/19 Plaintiff, WALTER M. MODLER III Motion for Counsel Knight Law Group, LLP's Fees, Costs and expenses ResID 36126

Jury Trial

Jury Trial DAY #1 05/28/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 7 days

Ruling

Ruling 03/27/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Substitution of attorney rejected: Scott S. Shepardson is already an attorney of record in this case. Returned via efile

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: continued from 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction - Comment: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITH prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/18/2020: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketClerk's Entry of Costs on Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: on Defendant's Motion to Strike Tax Costs NOW THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED as follows: 1. Defendant's Motion to Strike/Tax Costs filed by Plaintiff is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; 2. Plaintiff is awarded a total amount of costs and expenses in the amount of $27,029.65. 3. The clerk is ordered to add costs of $27,029.65 to the Judgment previously entered in on 1-3-20. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Ruling on Defendant's Motion to Strike/Tax Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration and Order - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: IT IS HEREBY GRANTED granted that the Order to Show Cause currently scheduled with the court to be heard on February 14, 2020 has been continued to March 30, 2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
184 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Case Reassignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: FILED BY JEANETTE C. SUAREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes - Comment: ***THOMAS S.CLARK***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO FCA US LLC ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/24/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketDemand for Jury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/02/17 Hearing Time: 08:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less