This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:45:04 (UTC).

WALLACE VS MANCERA

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 WALLACE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MANCERA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3080

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALLACE, CHARISH

Defendant

MANCERA, GUADALUPE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Lack of Prosecution Before Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Small Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: No Proof Of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Order Dismissing Action (Full) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: AS TO CHARISH WALLACE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: WALLACE, CHARISH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO CHARISH WALLACE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN "W"

    Read MoreRead Less