This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:31:55 (UTC).

WAHR FINANCIAL GROUP LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS MILLER

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 WAHR FINANCIAL GROUP LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MILLER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0630

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WAHR FINANCIAL GROUP LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

MILLER, RUSSELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENOSIAN, JOHN P

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: MEMO OF COSTS & WRIT OF EXECUTION

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: MEMORANDUM OF COST & WRIT OF EXECUTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Kern County. Pick up ABCLEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: MEMO OF COSTS & WRIT OF EXECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: MEMORANDUM OF COST & WRIT OF EXECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA PICK TO ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: WAHR FINANCIAL GROUP LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Awarded Against: MILLER, RUSSELL; Amount; Damages: $2,600.00; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 0.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $520.00; Costs: $246.00; Other: $0.00; Total: $3366.00; Party: Names: WAHR FINANCIAL GROUP LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; MILLER, RUSSELL

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE; Award of Attorney Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Comment: as to Russell Miller

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to Does 1 to 15 inclusive only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: as to Russell Miller

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: IN SUPPORT OF REDUCED FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less