This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/25/2020 at 20:56:15 (UTC).

WADY VS JPMORGAN

Case Summary

On 04/10/2012 WADY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JPMORGAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brumfield, Lorna H., Palmer, William D. and Friedman, Gary T.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6310

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Palmer, William D.

Friedman, Gary T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WADY, MARY D.

Defendants

(CHF)

(JPM)

JP MORGAN CHASE NA

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEM, (MERS), COMPANY

CHASE HOME FINANCE, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WHITTINGTON, MICHAEL T

FLYNN-BROWN, JOSHUA

Defendant Attorneys

AGOGLIA, MICHAEL J

ANEZCYA, ALEXANDRIA A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2014
  • DocketCourt Trial - Original Type: Court Trial; Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Original Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Judicial Officer: Friedman, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: CT/FCMC 02/24/14 (DEPT 17) T/E 4 DAYS CT/FCMC 02/24/14 (DEPT 17) T/E 4 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: PURSUANT TO CRC RULE 3.1385 CONT'D FROM 07/08/13 PURSUANT TO CRC RULE 3.1385 CONT'D FROM 07/08/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2013
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • Docket800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for WADY, MARY D. (PL-1). Received from MICHAEL T. WHITTINGTON, check no(s) 2262. Receipt #729990 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: DISMISSED ~ calid=2289701 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4170, CourtDate:08/07/2013, Courtroom:17, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:23, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LHB, Deputy:allisonm, SystemDate:7/8/2013 9:42:14 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Not Entered - Comment: PLAINTIFF HAS A FEE WAIVER ON FILE, FIRST APPEARANCE FEE HAS NOT BEEN PAID.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2013
  • DocketNP4170 - Comment: PURSUANT TO CRC, RULE 3.1385. Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC, RULE 3.1385. HEARING BEFORE TRIAL. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: MARY D. WADY (PL-1) APPEARS BY MICHAEL T WHITTINGTON ESQ. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANTS, NOR COUNSEL OF RECORD. *************************************************************************************** THE COURT FINDS AS FOLLOWS: CAUSE IS CONTINUED TO 8/7/2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DIV/DEPT 17 FOR HEARING ON CAL: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: DISMISSAL BEFORE THE HON. LORNA H BRUMFIELD OR OTHER ASSIGNED JUDICIAL OFFICER. BOTH COUNSEL ARE TO PERSONALLY APPEAR IF DISMISSAL HAS NOT YET BEEN FILED. COUNSEL FOR MARY D. WADY (PL-1) TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2013
  • Docket4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: PURSUANT TO C.R.C. 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2012
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: COMPLAINT FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND DAMAGES HEARING DATE: 05/17/2012 HEARING TIME: 0830 HEARING DEPT/DIV: 15 FILED BY MARY D WADY, IN PRO PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2012
  • DocketEx Parte Application / Petition - Comment: FOR: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDERS FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDERS TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; AND TRANSFER OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER, CAS NO M-1502-CL20258 TO THE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT CASE NO. S-1500-CV 276310 WDP; CERTIFICATION RE: NOTICE HEARING DATE: 05/17/2012 HEARING TIME: 0830 HEARING DEPT/DIV: 15 FILED BY MARY D WADY, IN PRO PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2012
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint - Comment: FILED BY MARY D. WADY - IN PRO-PER NO SUMMONS ISSUED AS NONE PROVIDED NO NEW PLAINTIFFS NEW DEFENDANTS: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEM,(MERS), COMPANY REMOVED DEFENDANTS: CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE COMPANY AND MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEM,(MERS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • DocketNotice / Assign / Status / JES - Comment: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE WILLIAM D PALMER FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 15 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "WDP" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE WILLIAM D PALMER ON Oct 09, 2012 AT 8:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 15 OF THIS COURT. CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS ARE TO BE FILED AT LEAST 15 DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. ALL PARTIES SHALL COMPLY WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. APPEARANCE BY THE ATTORNEY RESPONSIBLE FOR THE TRIAL OF THIS ACTION IS MANDATORY. NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: You are required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date with the service of the Summons, Complaint (Local Rule 3.8 (a)), ADR Information Packet, Civil Mediation Information Brochure, and ADR Stipulation and Order Form. [CRC Rule 3.221] NOTICE TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: If you are bringing a cross complaint against new parties, you are, likewise, required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date on the new cross defendants. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE WILLIAM D PALMER FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 15 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "WDP" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE WILLIAM D PALMER ON Oct 09, 2012 AT 8:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 15 OF THIS COURT. CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS ARE TO BE FILED AT LEAST 15 DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. ALL PARTIES SHALL COMPLY WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. APPEARANCE BY THE ATTORNEY RESPONSIBLE FOR THE TRIAL OF THIS ACTION IS MANDATORY. NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: You are required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date with the service of the Summons, Complaint (Local Rule 3.8 (a)), ADR Information Packet, Civil Mediation Information Brochure, and ADR Stipulation and Order Form. [CRC Rule 3.221] NOTICE TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: If you are bringing a cross complaint against new parties, you are, likewise, required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date on the new cross defendants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 24, 2012 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_15 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 24, 2012 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_15 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: GRANTED IN WHOLE AS TO MARY D WADY SIGNED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: IN PRO PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: FILED BY MARY D WADY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 636

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chase Home Finance LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGOGLIA, MICHAEL J