This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/21/2021 at 07:31:50 (UTC).

WADE SHELTON CAMERON DECEASED

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 WADE SHELTON CAMERON DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2409

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CAMERON, SCOTT F

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MCINTOSH, THOMAS S

 

Court Documents

Petition for Letters

Petition for Letters 06/17/2021: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING -

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate and Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Re: Report of status of administrator pursuant to PC 12200 et seq. or petition to close estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketInventory with Property Tax Certificate - Comment: Inventory & Appraisal - Partial 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketLetters of Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketOrder For Probate - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters - Petition for Letters 06/17/2021: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate and Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Confidential Supplement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative - Comment: DUTIES & LIABILITIES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCINTOSH, THOMAS S